PA HB1426 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 22, 1978 (P.L.1166, No.274), referred to as the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency Law, further providing for Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency.
Title
Further providing for Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - House - HB 1426 PN 1748, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-06-02 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-13 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-12 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-12 | First consideration | |
2009-05-12 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to JUDICIARY |