PA HB1426 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-30 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-30 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 19, 1931 (P.L.589, No.202), referred to as the Barbers' License Law, providing for authorization of barber school as institution of postsecondary education.
Title
Providing for authorization of barber school as institution of postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-23 - House - HB 1426 PN 1860, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-30 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-10-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-10-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-22 | House | Second consideration |
2013-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |