PA HB1429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 30, 1974 (P.L.13, No.6), referred to as the Loan Interest and Protection Law, in protective provisions, further providing for notice of intention to foreclose.
Title
In protective provisions, further providing for notice of intention to foreclose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |