PA HB1439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for mental health parity and access to addiction treatment.
Title
In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for mental health parity and access to addiction treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1439 PN 3629, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1439 PN 3629, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04692 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A04692 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1439 PN 3629, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04692 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A04692 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 89 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2020-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |