PA HB146 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-25 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto, defeated Oct. 25, 2022 (132-68)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-25 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto, defeated Oct. 25, 2022 (132-68)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions and for parole power.
Title
In Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions and for parole power.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 3329, OVERRIDE VETO (Y: 132 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 3329, CONCUR (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 146 PN 3329, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 915, FP (Y: 144 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 112, 2021 A230, BERNSTINE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 3329, CONCUR (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 146 PN 3329, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 915, FP (Y: 144 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 146 PN 112, 2021 A230, BERNSTINE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-25 | Senate | Motion to override the Governor's Veto, defeated Oct. 25, 2022 (132-68) |
2022-09-30 | Senate | In the House |
2022-09-30 | House | Veto No. 10 |
2022-09-30 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2022-09-20 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-09-20 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-09-19 | House | Signed in House |
2022-09-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (133-69) |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-06 | House | In the House |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-9) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-03-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-58) |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |