PA HB1477 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for use of records by licensing agencies; providing for preliminary provisions and for Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; consolidating the provisions of Act 48 of 1993; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for use of records by licensing agencies; providing for preliminary provisions and for Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; consolidating the provisions of Act 48 of 1993; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1477 PN 3057, FP (Y: 193 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1477 PN 3005, 2019 A4343, DELOZIER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04177 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04177 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-12-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-4)
2019-12-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-12-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-09HouseReported as amended
2019-05-22HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1477&pn=1860
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1477&pn=3005
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1477&pn=3057
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1471
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1472
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=988
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1001
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/18/2019&RollCallId=1564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1471
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1472

Bill Comments

feedback