PA HB1479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 35729, on that portion of State Route 3041 in Texas Township, Wayne County, as the PFC Raymond P. Schwesinger Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 35729, on that portion of State Route 3041 in Texas Township, Wayne County, as the PFC Raymond P. Schwesinger Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1886, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as committed
2019-05-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1479
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1479&pn=1886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=677
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=817
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=522
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=872

Bill Comments

feedback