PA HB148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 25488, carrying State Route 1011 over the Mix Creek, Eldred Township, McKean County, as the Sgt. Neil K. Dorrion Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 25488, carrying State Route 1011 over the Mix Creek, Eldred Township, McKean County, as the Sgt. Neil K. Dorrion Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 148 PN 113, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 148 PN 113, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |