PA HB1496 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-29 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on June 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-29 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for reports to Department of Education, for contracts with private residential rehabilitative institutions and certain criteria in department audits and for financial reports.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for reports to Department of Education, for contracts with private residential rehabilitative institutions and certain criteria in department audits and for financial reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-01-29 | Removed from table | |
2008-01-28 | Laid on the table | |
2008-01-28 | First consideration | |
2008-01-28 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-07 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1496 |