PA HB1496 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1496 PN 3918, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1496 PN 3918, CONCUR (Y: 178 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1496 PN 3459, FP (Y: 187 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06930 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1496 PN 3918, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1496 PN 3918, CONCUR (Y: 178 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1496 PN 3459, FP (Y: 187 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06930 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Act No. 134 |
2016-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (178-12) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-8) |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-13 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |