PA HB1510 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 183 from Segment 0040/Offset 2555 to Segment 110/Offset 1180 in Berks County as the Trooper Wayne C. Ebert Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 183 from Segment 0040/Offset 2555 to Segment 110/Offset 1180 in Berks County as the Trooper Wayne C. Ebert Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1510 PN 1895, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as committed
2019-05-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1510
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1510&pn=1895
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=818
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=523

Bill Comments

feedback