PA HB1511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificates of public convenience, further providing for enumeration of acts requiring certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In certificates of public convenience, further providing for enumeration of acts requiring certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1511 PN 1928, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as committed
2019-05-30HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1511
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1511&pn=1928
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=612
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=864
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=897

Bill Comments

feedback