PA HB1519 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program; and establishing the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Program; and establishing the Commonwealth Specialty Crop Block Grant Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1519 PN 2162, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1519 PN 1914, 2019 A1937, RABB (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-06-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as committed
2019-05-29HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1519
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1519&pn=1914
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1519&pn=2162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=630
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=731
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=476
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=839

Bill Comments

feedback