PA HB1524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county and for licenses not assignable and transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations, liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county and for licenses not assignable and transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1524 PN 2066, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1524 PN 2066, FP (Y: 135 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1524 PN 1988, 2019 A1654, SUSP RULES, BURNS (Y: 83 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1524 PN 1988, 2019 A1653, SUSP RULES, BURNS (Y: 89 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1524 PN 1988, 2019 A1684, LAWRENCE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01541 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01539 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateAct No. 57
2019-07-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-26SenateSigned in House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-06-14SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (135-64)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as amended
2019-05-29HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1524
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1524&pn=1919
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1524&pn=1988
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1524&pn=2066
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=606
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=378
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=379
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=655
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=394
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=453
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=216

Bill Comments

feedback