PA HB1526 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, providing for Agriculture-Linked Investment Program; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, providing for Agriculture-Linked Investment Program; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1526 PN 2126, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1526 PN 2126, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1526 PN 1921, 2019 A1777, IRVIN (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct No. 37
2019-07-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-26SenateSigned in House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as committed
2019-06-20SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-06-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-06-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as committed
2019-05-29HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1526
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1526&pn=1921
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1526&pn=2126
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/17/2019&RollCallId=796
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=392
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=217

Bill Comments

feedback