PA HB1534 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts or practices and exclusions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts or practices and exclusions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1534 PN 1952, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as committed
2019-06-03HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1534
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1534&pn=1952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=613
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=898

Bill Comments

feedback