PA HB1537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1537 PN 1936, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as committed
2019-05-30HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1537
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1537&pn=1936
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=605
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=736
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=847

Bill Comments

feedback