PA HB1538 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-11)
Status: Enrolled on November 14 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Veto No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 14 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-21 - Veto No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adding provisions for law enforcement activities by providing for release of law enforcement officer information when firearm discharged or use of force.
Title
Adding provisions for law enforcement activities by providing for release of law enforcement officer information when firearm discharged or use of force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 4125, CONCUR (Y: 151 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1538 PN 4125, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, FP (Y: 162 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, MOT TABLE, THOMAS (Y: 38 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, MOT CONST, THOMAS (Y: 176 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, 2015 A4165, SUSP RULES, BROWN, V. (Y: 70 N: 130 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03517 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03517 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 4125, CONCUR (Y: 151 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1538 PN 4125, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, FP (Y: 162 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, MOT TABLE, THOMAS (Y: 38 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, MOT CONST, THOMAS (Y: 176 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 2509, 2015 A4165, SUSP RULES, BROWN, V. (Y: 70 N: 130 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03517 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03517 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Veto No. 8 |
2016-11-21 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2016-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-11-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (151-32) |
2016-10-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-9) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-11-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (162-38) |
2015-11-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-16 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-09-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |