PA HB1547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the highway interchange of U.S. Route 422 with Pennsylvania Route 66, Manor Township, Armstrong County, as the Senator Donald C. White Interchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the highway interchange of U.S. Route 422 with Pennsylvania Route 66, Manor Township, Armstrong County, as the Senator Donald C. White Interchange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1547 PN 1963, FP (Y: 180 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (180-12)
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as committed
2019-06-03HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1547
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1547&pn=1963
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=680
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=819
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=874

Bill Comments

feedback