PA HB1549 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for imposition of tax; and, in special taxing authority, further providing for special taxing authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for imposition of tax; and, in special taxing authority, further providing for special taxing authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1549 PN 2118, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1549 PN 2017, 2019 A1797, GABLER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01616 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-06-14SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2118
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as amended
2019-06-03HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1549
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1549&pn=1965
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1549&pn=2017
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1549&pn=2106
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1549&pn=2118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=633
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=698
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=425
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=770
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=340

Bill Comments

feedback