PA HB1557 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 24, 1968 (P.L.1040, No.318), known as the Coal Refuse Disposal Control Act, further providing for designating areas unsuitable for coal refuse disposal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for designating areas unsuitable for coal refuse disposal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1557 PN 2193, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1557 PN 1996, 2019 A2178, GABLER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-27SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-25SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-25SenateReported as committed
2019-06-21SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-06-04HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1557
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1557&pn=1996
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1557&pn=2193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=663
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=820
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=519
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=875
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=427

Bill Comments

feedback