PA HB1566 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties of the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs, further providing for civil penalties.
Title
In powers and duties of the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs, further providing for civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 4336, FP (Y: 115 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 1980, 2019 A5877, LAWRENCE (Y: 114 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 1980, 2019 A6875, KORTZ (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 4336, FP (Y: 115 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 1980, 2019 A5877, LAWRENCE (Y: 114 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1566 PN 1980, 2019 A6875, KORTZ (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2020-09-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (115-87) |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-01 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |