PA HB1569 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assessments of persons and property, providing for limitation on tax increase after countywide reassessment in cities and counties of the first class.
Title
In assessments of persons and property, providing for limitation on tax increase after countywide reassessment in cities and counties of the first class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03757 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03757 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |