PA HB1583 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as The Tax Reform Code, in personal income tax, providing for paid tax return preparers and required information on personal income tax return.
Title
In personal income tax, providing for paid tax return preparers and required information on personal income tax return.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Peifer [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] |
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01761 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01761 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to FINANCE |