PA HB1589 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in financially distressed municipalities, providing for financial recovery; in oil and gas wells, providing for the Environmental Stewardship Fund; in tax credits, providing for Department of Community and Economic Development; in special funds, further providing for funding, for State Workers' Insurance Board, for expiration and for other grants; in additional special funds, further providing for use of the Tobacco Settlement Fund and for distributions from the Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund and providing for miscellaneous limitations and transfers and for the Natural Gas Infrastructure Development Fund; in general budget implementation, further providing for the Department of General Services, providing for the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, further providing for the Department of Human Services, for the Pennsylvania State Police and providing for the Commonwealth Financing Authority; providing for school district debt refinancing bonds; providing for 2015-2016 budget implementation; and making editorial changes.
Title
In financially distressed municipalities, providing for financial recovery; in oil and gas wells, providing for the Environmental Stewardship Fund; in tax credits, providing for Department of Community and Economic Development; in special funds, further providing for funding, for State Workers' Insurance Board, for expiration and for other grants; in additional special funds, further providing for use of the Tobacco Settlement Fund and for distributions from the Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund and providing for miscellaneous limitations and transfers and for the Natural Gas Infrastructure Development Fund; in general budget implementation, further providing for the Department of General Services, providing for the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, further providing for the Department of Human Services, for the Pennsylvania State Police and providing for the Commonwealth Financing Authority; providing for school district debt refinancing bonds; providing for 2015-2016 budget implementation; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, CONCUR (Y: 149 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 172 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3086, A6753, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-6753 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 3086, FP (Y: 176 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06473 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 2811, 2015 A6286, STEPHENS (Y: 14 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 172 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1589 PN 3086, A6753, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-6753 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 3086, FP (Y: 176 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06473 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1589 PN 2811, 2015 A6286, STEPHENS (Y: 14 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Act No. 25 |
2016-04-25 | House | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2016-04-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (149-45) |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-04-13 | House | In the House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Final passage (37-11) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (38-11) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (39-10) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (176-11) |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-04 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-23 | House | Removed from table |
2016-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-10 | House | First consideration |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |