PA HB159 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions, for reporting procedure, for disposition of complaints received, for responsibility for investigation, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database and for release of information in confidential reports.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for definitions, for reporting procedure, for disposition of complaints received, for responsibility for investigation, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database and for release of information in confidential reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 2326, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A02729 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 2326, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A02729 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-11-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-09 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |