PA HB1590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth Financing Authority, establishing the Dairy Investment Program and Dairy Investment Program Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth Financing Authority, establishing the Dairy Investment Program and Dairy Investment Program Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1590 PN 2213, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1590 PN 2213, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1590 PN 2183, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1590 PN 2104, 2019 A2122, OWLETT (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01779 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseAct No. 38
2019-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-27HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-27HouseSigned in House
2019-06-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-26HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-26HouseIn the House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-06-21SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as amended
2019-06-07HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1590
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1590&pn=2049
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1590&pn=2104
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1590&pn=2183
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1590&pn=2213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=691
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=472
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=782
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=849
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=455
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=617

Bill Comments

feedback