PA HB1595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 8671, on that portion of Washington Street over the Conemaugh River in Johnstown City, Cambria County, as the SFC Raymond R. Buchan Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 8671, on that portion of Washington Street over the Conemaugh River in Johnstown City, Cambria County, as the SFC Raymond R. Buchan Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1595 PN 2054, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-26HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as committed
2019-06-07HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1595
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1595&pn=2054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=983
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=613

Bill Comments

feedback