PA HB1597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the highway interchange of U.S. Route 222 with Mohns Hill Road, Cumru Township, Berks County, as the Corporal Mahlon L. Fink Iwo Jima Memorial Highway Interchange; designating the portion of State Route 1015, also known as Knights Road, between State Route 63 and U.S. Route 13 in the City of Philadelphia as the Sergeant James O'Connor IV Memorial Highway; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57213, carrying State Route 1036 over Six Mile Run, Broad Top Township, Bedford County, as the Sergeant David Leon Barber Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 52785, on that portion of State Route 4027 over Bald Eagle Creek, Snyder Township, Blair County, as the Cpl. Donald L. Westley Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 48976, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 669 that crosses the Casselman River at the west end of Ord Street, Salisbury Borough, Somerset County, as the Sergeant Stephen M. Minick Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 31586, on that portion of State Route 2004 carrying Broadway Street over the Casselman River, in Summit Township, Somerset County, as the Airman Michael L. Menser Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15279, on that portion of State Route 2025, also known as Morton Avenue, over Stony Creek in Morton Borough, Delaware County, as the Captain Michael Malinowski, Sr., Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 2012 in Monroe County as the Reverend Dr. Bishop William Earl Lee Highway; designating the bridge on I-70 in Westmoreland County over the Youghiogheny River as the Matthew Smelser Memorial Bridge; designating the portion of County Line Road (SR 2038) between N. Warminster Road and Newtown Road in Bucks County as the Captain William J. Ahlum Memorial Highway; and designating the portion of County Line Road (SR 2038) between N. Warminster Road and Jacksonville Road in Bucks County, as the Specialist 4 Harold E. Cashman Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating the highway interchange of U.S. Route 222 with Mohns Hill Road, Cumru Township, Berks County, as the Corporal Mahlon L. Fink Iwo Jima Memorial Highway Interchange; designating the portion of State Route 1015, also known as Knights Road, between State Route 63 and U.S. Route 13 in the City of Philadelphia as the Sergeant James O'Connor IV Memorial Highway; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57213, carrying State Route 1036 over Six Mile Run, Broad Top Township, Bedford County, as the Sergeant David Leon Barber Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 52785, on that portion of State Route 4027 over Bald Eagle Creek, Snyder Township, Blair County, as the Cpl. Donald L. Westley Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 48976, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 669 that crosses the Casselman River at the west end of Ord Street, Salisbury Borough, Somerset County, as the Sergeant Stephen M. Minick Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 31586, on that portion of State Route 2004 carrying Broadway Street over the Casselman River, in Summit Township, Somerset County, as the Airman Michael L. Menser Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15279, on that portion of State Route 2025, also known as Morton Avenue, over Stony Creek in Morton Borough, Delaware County, as the Captain Michael Malinowski, Sr., Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 2012 in Monroe County as the Reverend Dr. Bishop William Earl Lee Highway; designating the bridge on I-70 in Westmoreland County over the Youghiogheny River as the Matthew Smelser Memorial Bridge; designating the portion of County Line Road (SR 2038) between N. Warminster Road and Newtown Road in Bucks County as the Captain William J. Ahlum Memorial Highway; and designating the portion of County Line Road (SR 2038) between N. Warminster Road and Jacksonville Road in Bucks County, as the Specialist 4 Harold E. Cashman Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1597 PN 4010, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 4010, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2943, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2056, 2019 A3718, GILLEN (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1597 PN 4010, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 4010, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2943, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2056, 2019 A3718, GILLEN (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 47 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-24 | House | In the House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |