PA HB1615 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission; in school districts, providing for full academic year requirements; in school finances, further providing for annual budget, additional or increased appropriations and transfer of funds; in grounds and buildings, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; in district superintendents and assistant district superintendents, further providing for eligibility; in pupils and attendance, further providing for definitions and for nonprofit school food program; in Drug and Alcohol Recovery High School Pilot Program, further providing for audit required; establishing the Innovation Schools Program; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and reimbursement of payments; in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions, for qualification and application by organizations, for application by business firms, for tax credits, for limitations and for opportunity scholarships; adding provisions relating to postsecondary institution sexual harassment and sexual violence policy and online reporting system; in school districts of the first class, further providing for board of public education and additional duties; in ready-to-succeed scholarship, further providing for agency duties relating to eligibility criteria; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2019-2020; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for payments on account of pupils enrolled in vocational curriculums, for student-weighted basic education funding, for payments to intermediate units, for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status, for Ready-to-Learn Block Grant and for payment of required contribution for public school employees' social security and providing for advanced placement and International Baccalaureate exam fees; providing for fostering independence through education; and providing for references to "area vocational-technical school" and "vocational curriculums" in statute or regulation.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission; in school districts, providing for full academic year requirements; in school finances, further providing for annual budget, additional or increased appropriations and transfer of funds; in grounds and buildings, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; in district superintendents and assistant district superintendents, further providing for eligibility; in pupils and attendance, further providing for definitions and for nonprofit school food program; in Drug and Alcohol Recovery High School Pilot Program, further providing for audit required; establishing the Innovation Schools Program; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and reimbursement of payments; in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions, for qualification and application by organizations, for application by business firms, for tax credits, for limitations and for opportunity scholarships; adding provisions relating to postsecondary institution sexual harassment and sexual violence policy and online reporting system; in school districts of the first class, further providing for board of public education and additional duties; in ready-to-succeed scholarship, further providing for agency duties relating to eligibility criteria; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2019-2020; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for payments on account of pupils enrolled in vocational curriculums, for student-weighted basic education funding, for payments to intermediate units, for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status, for Ready-to-Learn Block Grant and for payment of required contribution for public school employees' social security and providing for advanced placement and International Baccalaureate exam fees; providing for fostering independence through education; and providing for references to "area vocational-technical school" and "vocational curriculums" in statute or regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, CONCUR (Y: 160 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, MOT RECON, HARRIS (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, CONCUR (Y: 77 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, MOT RECOM, DERMODY (Y: 93 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2084, FP (Y: 132 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, MOT RECON, HARRIS (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, CONCUR (Y: 77 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2268, MOT RECOM, DERMODY (Y: 93 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1615 PN 2084, FP (Y: 132 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 16 |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (160-39) |
2019-06-28 | House | Vote on concurrence in Senate amendments reconsidered (196-3) |
2019-06-27 | House | House non-concurred in Senate amendments (77-121) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-27 | House | In the House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (37-13) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (132-67) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to RULES |