PA HB1617 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for brand registration, for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for brand registration, for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1617 PN 4572, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1617 PN 4572, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1617 PN 2737, FP (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A03168 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 125
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-19HouseSigned in House
2020-11-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (191-11)
2020-11-19HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-18HouseReferred to RULES
2020-11-17HouseIn the House
2020-11-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (42-6)
2020-10-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-10-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-10-06SenateSecond consideration
2020-10-05SenateFirst consideration
2020-10-05SenateReported as committed
2019-10-31SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-10-29SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-16)
2019-10-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-28HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-28HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-28HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-21HouseReported as amended
2019-06-11HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1617
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1617&pn=2101
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1617&pn=2737
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1617&pn=4544
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1617&pn=4572
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=1147
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=1148
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=778
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1303
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=10/05/2020&RollCallId=1180
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=1249
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=740
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/19/2020&RollCallId=2646
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1751

Bill Comments

feedback