PA HB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of May 1, 1913 (P.L.155, No.104), referred to as the Separations Act, and making related repeals.
Title
Repealing the act of May 1, 1913 (P.L.155, No.104), referred to as the Separations Act, and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02097 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02097 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |