PA HB1655 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, providing for concurrent jurisdiction to prosecute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, providing for concurrent jurisdiction to prosecute.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05380 (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-15HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-04HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-04HouseReported as amended
2019-06-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback