PA HB1662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 24, 2012 (P.L.1198, No.148), known as the Methadone Death and Incident Review Act, further providing for title of act, for short title, for definitions, for establishment of Methadone Death and Incident Review Team, for team duties, for duties of coroner and medical examiner, for review procedures and for confidentiality.
Title
Further providing for title of act, for short title, for definitions, for establishment of Methadone Death and Incident Review Team, for team duties, for duties of coroner and medical examiner, for review procedures and for confidentiality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 4050, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1662 PN 4050, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 2528, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 2207, 2019 A2834, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 4050, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1662 PN 4050, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 2528, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1662 PN 2207, 2019 A2834, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Act No. 126 |
2020-11-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-11-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-18 | House | Signed in House |
2020-11-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-11-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-21 | House | In the House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4050 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-09-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-09-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |