PA HB1671 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 3, 1992 (P.L.28, No.11), known as the Tuition Account Programs and College Savings Bond Act, in tuition account program, further providing for declaration of policy, for definitions, for Tuition Account Programs Bureau, for powers of department, for Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program, for Tuition Account Investment Program, for general provisions governing both tuition account programs, for Federal taxation; establishing the Keystone Scholars Grant Program and the Keystone Scholars Grant Program Account; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In tuition account program, further providing for declaration of policy, for definitions, for Tuition Account Programs Bureau, for powers of department, for Tuition Account Guaranteed Savings Program, for Tuition Account Investment Program, for general provisions governing both tuition account programs, for Federal taxation; establishing the Keystone Scholars Grant Program and the Keystone Scholars Grant Program Account; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1671 PN 2229, 2019 A2501, PEIFER (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-27HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-25HouseReported as committed
2019-06-24HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1671
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1671&pn=2229
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1671&pn=2283
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=918
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=966
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=622

Bill Comments

feedback