PA HB1675 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for returns for deceased persons.
Title
Further providing for returns for deceased persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-14 | Removed from table | |
2009-12-09 | Laid on the table | |
2009-12-09 | First consideration | |
2009-12-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to FINANCE |