PA HB1683 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies.
Title
Providing for incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1683 PN 4128, CONCUR (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1683 PN 4128, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1683 PN 2507, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04021 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04021 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1683 PN 4128, CONCUR (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1683 PN 4128, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1683 PN 2507, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04021 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04021 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Act No. 172 |
2016-11-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-11-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (182-0) |
2016-10-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-06 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |