PA HB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax; in general provisions, further providing for administrative bank attachment for accounts of obligors to the Commonwealth and providing for collection of assessed taxes and for criminal tax prosecutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax; in general provisions, further providing for administrative bank attachment for accounts of obligors to the Commonwealth and providing for collection of assessed taxes and for criminal tax prosecutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 17 PN 2900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 17 PN 1851, FP (Y: 155 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01404 (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01392 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20HouseReferred to RULES
2019-11-19HouseIn the House
2019-11-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2019-11-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-18SenateRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-18SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-11-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-29SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-23SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-23SenateReported as committed
2019-09-25SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-09-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (155-31)
2019-09-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-09-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-09-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-15HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=17
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=0037
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=1851
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=2900
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=559
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=560
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=562
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=655
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/19/2019&RollCallId=1045
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=665
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=337
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=1437

Bill Comments

feedback