PA HB1718 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in service and facilities, further providing for definitions.
Title
In service and facilities, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |