PA HB1719 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 27659, on that portion of State Route 2034, also known as Edge Hill Road, over Pennsylvania Route 611, also known as Old York Road, in Abington Township, Montgomery County, as the Captain Samuel Schultz Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 27659, on that portion of State Route 2034, also known as Edge Hill Road, over Pennsylvania Route 611, also known as Old York Road, in Abington Township, Montgomery County, as the Captain Samuel Schultz Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |