PA HB1737 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Veto No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Veto No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the
Title
Amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Rep. Torren Ecker [R] | Rep. Mark Keller [R] |
Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1737 PN 4625, CONCUR (Y: 104 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1737 PN 4625, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1737 PN 2439, A7937, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-7937 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1737 PN 2439, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1737 PN 4625, CONCUR (Y: 104 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1737 PN 4625, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1737 PN 2439, A7937, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-7937 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1737 PN 2439, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | House | Veto No. 19 |
2020-11-30 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2020-11-20 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-20 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-20 | House | Signed in House |
2020-11-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (104-98) |
2020-11-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-11-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-11-19 | House | In the House |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-20) |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |