PA HB1750 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in general provisions relating to township officers, further providing for membership of associations and expenses of members.
Title
In general provisions relating to township officers, further providing for membership of associations and expenses of members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1750 PN 2341, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1750 PN 2341, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-08-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |