PA HB1754 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4021 over the Honeoye Creek, Sharon Township, Potter County, as the Tec 5 C. Virgil Voorhees Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4021 over the Honeoye Creek, Sharon Township, Potter County, as the Tec 5 C. Virgil Voorhees Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-08-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |