PA HB1755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 15, 1945 (P.L.547, No.217), known as the Conservation District Law, providing for legislative report.
Title
Providing for legislative report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1755 PN 2780, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03328 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1755 PN 2780, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03328 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-02-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-22 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-08-16 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |