PA HB1756 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1982 (P.L.1404, No.325), known as the Self-Service Storage Facility Act, further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.
Title
Further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Gillespie [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1756 PN 4384, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1756 PN 2941, 2019 A7168, ZABEL (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04006 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1756 PN 4384, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1756 PN 2941, 2019 A7168, ZABEL (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A04006 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2020-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-08-16 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |