PA HB176 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 5840, on that portion of SR 4010 (17th Street) over Interstate 99 in Logan Township, Blair County, as the Honorable Richard A. Geist Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 5840, on that portion of SR 4010 (17th Street) over Interstate 99 in Logan Township, Blair County, as the Honorable Richard A. Geist Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 144, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 144, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |