PA HB1776 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for COVID-19 homeowner protection.
Title
In emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for COVID-19 homeowner protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Andrew Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |