PA HB1782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1002, also known as Friend Lea Road, over U.S. Route 219 in Cambria Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Cyril T. Yeckley Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1002, also known as Friend Lea Road, over U.S. Route 219 in Cambria Township, Cambria County, as the PFC Cyril T. Yeckley Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02803 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |