PA HB1786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-14)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, establishing the First Responder Loan Forgiveness Program; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In incentives for municipal volunteers of fire companies and nonprofit emergency medical services agencies, establishing the First Responder Loan Forgiveness Program; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1786 PN 2764, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1786 PN 2509, 2019 A3297, SAINATO (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02790 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-10-23SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-10-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as amended
2019-08-30HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1786
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1786&pn=2376
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1786&pn=2509
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1786&pn=2764
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/18/2019&RollCallId=1031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/18/2019&RollCallId=1030
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=721
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=745
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=1264

Bill Comments

feedback