PA HB18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Re-referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Re-referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for prescription drugs and the treatment of work-related injuries; and, in procedure, further providing for peer review.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for prescription drugs and the treatment of work-related injuries; and, in procedure, further providing for peer review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - House Human Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 2014, MOT RECOM HUMAN SERVICES, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 102 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01831 (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01754 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 2014, MOT RECOM HUMAN SERVICES, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 102 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01831 (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01754 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Re-referred to RULES |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to RULES |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-committed to HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |